Global patent index - EP 1047803 A1

EP 1047803 A1 2000-11-02 - ALUMINIUM SLIDING BEARING ALLOY

Title (en)

ALUMINIUM SLIDING BEARING ALLOY

Title (de)

ALUMINIUM-GLEITLAGERLEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM POUR PALIER LISSE

Publication

EP 1047803 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956891 A

Priority

  • DE 19800433 A
  • EP 9806856 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19800433A1] The invention relates to an aluminium sliding bearing alloy, comprising 3 to 6 mass % zinc, 0.3 to 2.0 mass % copper, 0.2 to 1.0 mass % magnesium, 0.3 to 2.0 mass % silicon and 2 to 4.5 mass % lead. According to the invention, said alloy is obtained by means of continuous casting with a minimum dimension, i.e. a strand thickness of more than 20 mm, solidifying in a mould which is indirectly cooled only, with a withdrawal speed of 1 to 5 mm/s and with a cooling speed of less than 100 K/s.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/10; B22D 11/00; C22C 21/00; C22F 1/04; F16C 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 33/12 (2006.01); B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01); B22D 11/20 (2006.01); B22D 11/22 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/10 (2013.01); B22D 11/00 (2013.01); C22C 21/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935296A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19800433 A1 19990722; DE 19800433 C2 20020321; AT 210740 T 20011215; BR 9813717 A 20001010; EP 1047803 A1 20001102; EP 1047803 B1 20011212; ES 2169563 T3 20020701; JP 2002505375 A 20020219; US 6328823 B1 20011211; WO 9935296 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-12-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061029

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051029

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2005-10-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-10-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041018

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2169563

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802478

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-24

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 210740

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE