Global Patent Index - EP 1047825 A1

EP 1047825 A1 2000-11-02 - PART OF A DEVICE CONSISTING OF A THIN-WALLED SHEET AND STAMPING TOOL FOR PRODUCING A STRUCTURAL SURFACE ON THE PART OF SAID DEVICE

Title (en)

PART OF A DEVICE CONSISTING OF A THIN-WALLED SHEET AND STAMPING TOOL FOR PRODUCING A STRUCTURAL SURFACE ON THE PART OF SAID DEVICE

Title (de)

AUS DÜNNWANDIGEM BLECH BESTEHENDES GERÄTETEIL UND PRÄGEWERKZEUG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STRUKTURFLÄCHE AN DEM GERÄTETEIL

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'APPAREIL CONSTITUE DE TOLE A FAIBLE EPAISSEUR DE PAROI ET OUTIL D'ESTAMPAGE POUR PRODUIRE UNE SURFACE STRUCTUREE SUR LEDIT ELEMENT D'APPAREIL

Publication

EP 1047825 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966620 A

Priority

  • DE 19756516 A
  • EP 9808207 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756516A1] The thin-walled sheet metal component of an appliance has an embossed honeycomb surface structure (5), at least in zones. The surface is embossed between two dies, where one has a Vulkulane (RTM) cladding, a material with plastic distortion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/02; A47L 15/42; B29C 59/02; D06F 37/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 37/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/261 (2013.01); A47L 15/4246 (2013.01); D06F 37/264 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932703A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756516 A1 19990624; EP 1047825 A1 20001102; EP 1047825 B1 20021120; EP 1047825 B2 20070523; ES 2188040 T3 20030616; ES 2188040 T5 20071216; TR 200001739 T2 20020121; WO 9932703 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806378

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806378

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121215

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121215

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121215

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110304

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110307

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2007-09-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-06-13 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-05-23 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070523

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-09-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. KG

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188040 T3

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806378 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT