Global Patent Index - EP 1047834 A4

EP 1047834 A4 2000-12-13 - SILICA-ACID COLLOID BLEND IN A MICROPARTICLE SYSTEM USED IN PAPERMAKING

Title (en)

SILICA-ACID COLLOID BLEND IN A MICROPARTICLE SYSTEM USED IN PAPERMAKING

Title (de)

MISCHUNG AUS KIESELSÄURE UND SAUREM KOLLOID ZU EINEM MIKROPARTIKELSYSTEM FÜR DIE PAPIERHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MELANGE DE SILICE ET DE COLLOIDE ACIDE DANS UN SYSTEME MICROPARTICULAIRE UTILISE EN PAPETERIE

Publication

EP 1047834 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99946808 A

Priority

  • US 9920608 W
  • US 10137998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0017450A1] A microparticle system for use as a retention and drainage aid in the production of alkaline and acid paper products comprises a high molecular weight flocculant polymer (6) and a silica-acid colloid blend (7), and optionally a cationic coagulant or a medium molecular weight flocculant (5). The high molecular weight flocculant polymer (6) may be added to the furnish after the fan pump (1) and prior to the pressure screen (2); the silica-acid colloid blend (7) may be added to the furnish after the pressure screen (2), and optionally, the coagulant or medium molecular weight flocculant (5) may be added prior to the fan pump (1). Addition of the microparticle system to the paper furnish improves retention and drainage during the papermaking process and sheet formation. The acid colloid of the silica-acid colloid blend (7) is a polymer or a copolymer of a melamine aldehyde acid colloid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/10; C02F 5/10; D21H 17/45; D21H 17/47; D21H 17/51; D21H 17/55; D21H 17/63; D21H 17/68; D21H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 21/01 (2006.01); D21H 17/00 (2006.01); D21H 17/47 (2006.01); D21H 17/67 (2006.01); D21H 21/06 (2006.01); D21H 21/10 (2006.01); D21H 23/14 (2006.01); D21H 17/49 (2006.01); D21H 17/51 (2006.01); D21H 17/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/14 (2013.01); D21H 21/10 (2013.01); D21H 17/49 (2013.01); D21H 17/51 (2013.01); D21H 17/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0017450 A1 20000330; AT 326579 T 20060615; AU 5913399 A 20000410; AU 761790 B2 20030612; BR 9907290 A 20001003; CN 1231639 C 20051214; CN 1287585 A 20010314; DE 69931343 D1 20060622; DE 69931343 T2 20060928; EP 1047834 A1 20001102; EP 1047834 A4 20001213; EP 1047834 B1 20060517; ID 25782 A 20001102; JP 2002526680 A 20020820; NZ 504660 A 20021220

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060908

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060818

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060908

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060908

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-10-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061017

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060909

2006-09-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060828

2006-08-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931343 P 20060622

2006-06-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-17 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-17 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-17 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-05-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-01-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2000-12-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI