Global Patent Index - EP 1047840 A1

EP 1047840 A1 2000-11-02 - LINE-CHANGING DEVICE FOR TRACKS OF A MAGNETIC LEVITATION TRAIN

Title (en)

LINE-CHANGING DEVICE FOR TRACKS OF A MAGNETIC LEVITATION TRAIN

Title (de)

SPURWECHSELEINRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRWEGE EINER MAGNETSCHWEBEBAHN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR VARIER L'ECARTEMENT DE VOIES D'UN TRAIN A SUSTENTATION MAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1047840 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966843 A

Priority

  • DE 19800909 A
  • EP 9808397 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936627A1] The invention relates to a line-changing device for the tracks (1) of a magnetic levitation train. The tracks (1) are formed by track supports (4) arranged one after the other and can be connected with each other. To connect the tracks a track support (4) configured as a bendable support (5) is positioned along each track which can be bent to establish a connection between the tracks (1). In its bent state each bendable support (5) can be positioned in relation to the other bendable support (5). Along each track a connecting support (6) is arranged next to the bendable support (5), which connecting support can be moved out of the clearance gauge of the train so as to create a distance required for the train to pass across the rail joint embodied by the bendable supports (5). The invention consists of the fact that the connecting supports (6) can be bent so as to form a second rail joint and that the bendable supports (5) can be moved out of the clearance gauge of the train when the rail joint is established by means of the connecting supports (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 25/12 (2006.01); E01B 25/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 25/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936627A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936627 A1 19990722; CA 2317400 A1 19990722; DE 19800909 C1 19990826; EP 1047840 A1 20001102; EP 1047840 B1 20030326; HK 1033842 A1 20031205; JP 2002509210 A 20020326; RU 2221913 C2 20040120; US 6354225 B1 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-10-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807683

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061223

2005-12-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807683 P 20030430

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP TRANSRAPID GMBH

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE