Global patent index - EP 1047841 A1

EP 1047841 A1 2000-11-02 - PROFILE FOR A TRANSPORTABLE PROVISIONAL PAVEMENT WITH A NON-SKID SURFACE

Title (en)

PROFILE FOR A TRANSPORTABLE PROVISIONAL PAVEMENT WITH A NON-SKID SURFACE

Title (de)

PROFIL FÜR EINE TRANSPORTABLE BEHELFSFAHRBAHN MIT RUTSCHFESTER OBERFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

PROFIL POUR UNE CHAUSSEE PROVISOIRE TRANSPORTABLE DOTEE D'UNE SURFACE SUPERIEURE ANTIDERAPANTE

Publication

EP 1047841 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955905 A

Priority

  • DE 19852089 A
  • EP 9908220 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19852089C1] A plastic profile for a transport unit consists of a linkage roller on one longitudinal side and a cut-out for the roller of a neighboring profile. The profile consists of a base member (1) made of high density polyethylene and a thermoplastic elastomer layer to increase its slip resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 9/08; B29C 47/00; B29C 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 47/00 (2006.01); B29C 47/02 (2006.01); B29C 47/06 (2006.01); E01C 9/08 (2006.01); B29C 59/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 47/065 (2013.01); B29C 47/026 (2013.01); B29C 47/145 (2013.01); E01C 9/086 (2013.01); B29C 47/0019 (2013.01); B29C 47/003 (2013.01); B29C 59/08 (2013.01); B29K 2995/0072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0029676A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19852089 C1 20000309; EP 1047841 A1 20001102; WO 0029676 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-26 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20030502

2006-03-01 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFLEIDERER WATER SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVENT SYSTEMS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030503

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE