Global Patent Index - EP 1047851 A1

EP 1047851 A1 2000-11-02 - COVERING DEVICE ESPECIALLY FOR RECTANGULAR RECESSES IN TILED WALLS

Title (en)

COVERING DEVICE ESPECIALLY FOR RECTANGULAR RECESSES IN TILED WALLS

Title (de)

ABDECKVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUSSPARUNGEN VERFLIESTER WÄNDE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RECOUVREMENT POUR EVIDEMENTS DE MURS CARRELES

Publication

EP 1047851 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99900184 A

Priority

  • AT 9900008 W
  • AT 3698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936644A1] A covering device for recesses (2) in tiled walls (1), comprising a cover (3) with fastening fixtures (4) on the reverse side, covering one such recess. The fastening fixtures (4) are respectively comprised of a flexion spring (5) with a free limb (6) extending perpendicularly to the edge of the associated cover and supported inside the recess (2) when the cover (3) is closed under a deformation which prestresses said flexion spring (5). In order to produce an uncomplicated covering device that is easy to install, the limb (6) of the flexion spring (5) extends lengthwise from the reverse side of the cover to the back and has a convex curvature (7) protruding laterally above the edge of the cover enabling it to be wedged and supported on the inner surface (9) of the recess.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936644A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936644 A1 19990722; AT 406066 B 20000225; AT A3698 A 19990615; AU 1864099 A 19990802; DE 59908884 D1 20040422; EP 1047851 A1 20001102; EP 1047851 B1 20040317; ES 2218983 T3 20041116

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908884

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120113

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090112

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090112

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090112

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040817

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218983 T3

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908884 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT