Global Patent Index - EP 1047872 A1

EP 1047872 A1 2000-11-02 - FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZANLAGE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1047872 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99950453 A

Priority

  • DE 9902329 W
  • DE 19853090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19853090A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection system (1) for directly injecting fuel into combustion chambers (2) of an internal combustion engine. Said fuel injection system (1) has at least one fuel injection valve (4) for every combustion chamber (2) of the internal combustion engine. Said fuel injection valve can be inserted in a respective bore (16) formed on the cylinder head (3) of the internal combustion engine. Said fuel injection valve is arranged at an injection section (15) and has a fuel inlet opening (11). The fuel injection system is further provided with a fuel distributor (5) which has a fuel outlet opening (8) assigned to every fuel injection valve (4) which can be connected to the fuel inlet opening (11) of the fuel injection valve (4) and which can be fixed to the cylinder head (3) by fixing means (20) assigned to every fuel injection valve (4). A holding down device (30) is assigned to every fuel injection valve (4) and holds the fuel injection valve (4) down in the assigned bores (16) of the cylinder head. Every holding-down device (30) is connected to the assigned fixing means (20). Every fixing means (20) has a first fixture (23) for fixing the fuel distributor (5) to the cylinder head (3) and a second fixture (37) for impinging the assigned fuel injection valve (4) with a holding-down force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/04; F02M 55/02; F02M 69/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/04 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 61/04 (2013.01); F02M 69/462 (2013.01); F02M 69/465 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0029743A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19853090 A1 20000525; CZ 20002625 A3 20010516; CZ 293799 B6 20040818; EP 1047872 A1 20001102; EP 1047872 B1 20041006; JP 2002530569 A 20020917; RU 2226616 C2 20040410; US 6318341 B1 20011120; WO 0029743 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070729

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070729

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070729

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050916

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050125

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910742 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030218

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE