Global Patent Index - EP 1047876 A1

EP 1047876 A1 2000-11-02 - RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR HIGH PRESSURE FUEL SUPPLY

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR HIGH PRESSURE FUEL SUPPLY

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENPUMPE ZUR KRAFTSTOFFHOCHDRUCKVERSORGUNG

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTONS RADIAUX POUR ALIMENTATION HAUTE PRESSION EN CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1047876 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966165 A

Priority

  • DE 9803467 W
  • DE 19801353 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19801353A1] The pump casing top(10) has a through-hole(9) extending radially to the drive shaft(2) and into which is shrinked a sleeve(8) to house the piston(5). The casing top lies by a flat contact face(60) against a flat contact face(61) of casing base(1). The through-hole has a section(11) with a larger diameter to accommodate the sleeve, and a section(12) of smaller diameter to accommodate a shut-off element(20). The section with the smaller diameter is larger than the internal diameter of the sleeve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/047 (2006.01); F04B 1/053 (2006.01); F04B 53/00 (2006.01); F04B 53/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0421 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936698A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801353 A1 19990722; EP 1047876 A1 20001102; EP 1047876 B1 20030226; JP 2002509224 A 20020326; US 6698399 B1 20040302; WO 9936698 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807345

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807345 P 20030403

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010710

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT