Global Patent Index - EP 1047895 A1

EP 1047895 A1 2000-11-02 - VALVE

Title (en)

VALVE

Title (de)

VENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE

Publication

EP 1047895 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99950465 A

Priority

  • DE 9902342 W
  • DE 19854308 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19854308A1] The present invention relates to a valve mainly intended for the liquid circuit of a motor vehicle, wherein said valve includes a body (12) that comprises at least one inlet (14) and at least one outlet (16, 18) connected by a passageway (20). The valve also includes a shutter (22) in the form of a mobile flap (24) that controls the passageway (20). The passageway (20) includes a chamber (26) in which the flap (24) is arranged and into which the at least one inlet (14) and the at least one outlet (16, 18) open. The flap (24) is arranged so as to be capable of rotation in the valve body (12) and is capable of displacement between a first final position (38) and a second final position (40) using a control organ (36, 70), wherein said final positions (38, 40) define an angle ( alpha ) which is lower than 90 DEG .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 11/052

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 27/02 (2006.01); B60H 1/00 (2006.01); F16K 1/18 (2006.01); F16K 11/052 (2006.01); F01P 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00485 (2013.01); F16K 11/052 (2013.01); F01P 2007/146 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86847 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87812 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0031446A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854308 A1 20000531; EP 1047895 A1 20001102; JP 2002530610 A 20020917; US 6644352 B1 20031111; WO 0031446 A1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE