Global Patent Index - EP 1047913 A1

EP 1047913 A1 2000-11-02 - A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A WEDGE-SHAPED GASKET

Title (en)

A PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A WEDGE-SHAPED GASKET

Title (de)

PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER MIT KEILFÖRMIGER DICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A PLATEAUX DOTE D'UN JOINT EN BISEAU

Publication

EP 1047913 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900442 A

Priority

  • DK 9900012 W
  • DK 2898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935457A1] A plate heat exchanger comprising a plurality of stacked heat exchanger plates (1; 11) which each have four through openings (3, 4). The plate heat exchanger moreover comprises gaskets (2; 12) which, on one side of each plate (1; 11), define a first flow area (5) comprising two through openings (3) for a first heat exchanger medium, while the two other openings (4) are blocked, and, on the other side of the plate (1; 11), define a second flow area which has essentially the same extent as the first flow area (5), and which comprises two other through openings (4) for a second heat exchanger medium, while the two first openings (3) are blocked. The stacked heat exchanger plates (1; 11) thus form a plate heat exchanger having at least one area (7, 8) for each plate (1; 11) which is just provided with gaskets (2; 12) on one side. The gasket (2; 12), at least in an area in which gaskets (2; 12) are just provided between every second plate (1; 11), has a cross section which is wedge-shaped over a considerable part of the width of the gasket with the widest side facing the heat exchanger medium and the narrowest side facing away from the heat exchanger medium, and in this area each heat exchanger plate (1; 11) has a complementarily shaped gasket groove (6; 14, 15) to support the gasket (2; 12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935457A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935457 A1 19990715; AU 1960599 A 19990726; DE 69910729 D1 20031002; DE 69910729 T2 20040617; DK 174780 B1 20031103; DK 2898 A 19990713; EP 1047913 A1 20001102; EP 1047913 B1 20030827

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100112

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090302

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2003-12-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910729 P 20031002

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE SE

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020517

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE SE