Global patent index - EP 1047942 A1

EP 1047942 A1 2000-11-02 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF GROWTH FACTOR MIMETICS, GROWTH FACTORS AND INHIBITORS

Title (en)

METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF GROWTH FACTOR MIMETICS, GROWTH FACTORS AND INHIBITORS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DIE IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON WACHSTUMSFAKTOREN MIMETIKA, WACHSTUMSFAKTOREN UND INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS D'IDENTIFICATION DE SUBSTANCES MIMETIQUES DE FACTEURS DE CROISSANCE, DE FACTEURS DE CROISSANCE ET D'INHIBITEURS

Publication

EP 1047942 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903279 A

Priority

  • US 9901331 W
  • US 7225398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938008A1] Method to identify agonist or inhibitory antibodies to receptors involved in cellular proliferation, differentiation, survival or activation comprising the steps of immunizing an animal with stem/progenitor cells having surface molecules comprising the receptors, so as to generate a plurality of cells expressing one or more antibodies to the surface molecules, creating a library from the plurality of cells, comprising nucleic acid sequences encoding the antibodies, cloning the nucleic acid sequences from the library into surface display vectors so that the antibodies are surface displayed, and screening the surface displayed antibodies using target cells to identify agonist or inhibitory antibodies to the receptors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/53; C07H 21/04; C12N 15/63; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/536

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C40B 20/04 (2006.01); C40B 30/04 (2006.01); C40B 40/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01); G01N 33/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C40B 40/02 (2013.01); C07K 16/2863 (2013.01); C12N 15/1037 (2013.01); G01N 33/56972 (2013.01); G01N 33/74 (2013.01); C07K 2317/55 (2013.01); C07K 2317/622 (2013.01); G01N 2500/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938008 A1 19990729; AU 2333999 A 19990809; CA 2316755 A1 19990729; CA 2316755 C 20060404; EP 1047942 A1 20001102; EP 1047942 A4 20021030; JP 2003517566 A 20030527; JP 2004123695 A 20040422; JP 3515072 B2 20040405

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060831

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040420

2002-10-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALEXION ANTIBODY TECHNOLOGIES INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000706;LT PAYMENT 20000706;LV PAYMENT 20000706;MK PAYMENT 20000706;RO PAYMENT 20000706;SI PAYMENT 20000706