Global Patent Index - EP 1047962 A1

EP 1047962 A1 2000-11-02 - NEUTRAL-COLORED GRAY PHOTOCHROMIC PLASTIC OBJECT

Title (en)

NEUTRAL-COLORED GRAY PHOTOCHROMIC PLASTIC OBJECT

Title (de)

NEUTRALFARBENER GRAUER PHOTOCHROMER KUNSTSTOFFGEGENSTAND

Title (fr)

ARTICLE EN PLASTIQUE PHOTOCHROMIQUE GRIS NEUTRE

Publication

EP 1047962 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99959280 A

Priority

  • DE 19852680 A
  • DE 19902878 A
  • EP 9908791 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0029877A1] The present invention relates to a neutral-colored gray photochromic plastic object that remains neutral-colored or gray during lightening or darkening of luminosity. The inventive plastic object can be used more particularly as a neutral-colored photochromic spectacle glass.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 5/23; C09K 9/02; G02B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/02 (2006.01); C09K 9/02 (2006.01); G02B 1/04 (2006.01); G02B 5/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 9/02 (2013.01); G02B 1/041 (2013.01); G02B 5/23 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0029877A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0029877 A1 20000525; AU 1651900 A 20000605; AU 750198 B2 20020711; CA 2318239 A1 20000525; CA 2318239 C 20060502; EP 1047962 A1 20001102; JP 2002530686 A 20020917; US 6373615 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-02-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RODENSTOCK GMBH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE