Global Patent Index - EP 1047980 A1

EP 1047980 A1 2000-11-02 - PRINTING AND PHOTOCOPYING DEVICE AND METHOD WHEREBY ONE TONER MARK IS SCANNED AT AT LEAST TWO POINTS OF MEASUREMENT

Title (en)

PRINTING AND PHOTOCOPYING DEVICE AND METHOD WHEREBY ONE TONER MARK IS SCANNED AT AT LEAST TWO POINTS OF MEASUREMENT

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DRUCKEN ODER KOPIEREN, WOBEI EINE TONERMARKE AN MINDESTENS ZWEI MESSORTEN ABGETASTET WIRD

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION OU DE PHOTOCOPIE, UNE MARQUE DE TONER ETANT DETECTEE AU NIVEAU D'AU MOINS DEUX POINTS DE MESURE

Publication

EP 1047980 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904782 A

Priority

  • DE 19801521 A
  • DE 19821922 A
  • EP 9900211 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936834A1] The invention relates to an electrographic printing or photocopying device and method. A toner mark (10) is provided on a photoconductive drum and printed with toner using a developing station. The toner mark (10) is scanned by a sensor at two points of measurement (a1,a2). The amount of toner in a developing mixture consisting of two components depends upon the difference ( DELTA U) or the quotient of the amounts of the signals of the sensor at both points of measurement. A device which is also disclosed enables the exact length of the toner mark (10) to be determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08; G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/47 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0855 (2013.01); G03G 15/5041 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936834A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936834 A1 19990722; WO 9936834 A9 19991014; CA 2316162 A1 19990722; CA 2316162 C 20070904; EP 1047980 A1 20001102; EP 1047980 B1 20020410; JP 2002509291 A 20020326; US 6434346 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140115

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140904 AND 20140910

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140115

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-06-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140513

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59901179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59901179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59901179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020711

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB