Global patent index - EP 1047981 A1

EP 1047981 A1 2000-11-02 - WRISTWATCH QUICK FIXING DEVICE

Title (en)

WRISTWATCH QUICK FIXING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHNELLBEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ARMBANDUHR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION RAPIDE POUR MONTRE-BRACELET

Publication

EP 1047981 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98963631 A

Priority

  • FR 9802873 W
  • FR 9800578 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773622A1] Assembly (2) for rapid fixing of the end (2) of a strap (4) to the housing (5) of a watch (1). The fixing assembly (2) comprises a link element (6) integral with the strap and a link (7) integral with the housing. The link element being designed to mesh together. One of the link elements (6,7) is fixed in a movable manner to the strap or housing (4,5) with which it is integral, so that it can be moved between a closed or open position the two positions corresponding to the link elements (6,7) being locked together or free to separate from each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 37/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/1486 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2155 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2166 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4718 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936838A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773622 A1 19990716; FR 2773622 B1 20000218; AT 224554 T 20021015; CN 1165253 C 20040908; CN 1290358 A 20010404; DE 69808142 D1 20021024; DE 69808142 T2 20030430; EP 1047981 A1 20001102; EP 1047981 B1 20020918; ES 2182391 T3 20030301; PT 1047981 E 20021231; US 6408490 B1 20020625; WO 9936838 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MONTRES PEQUIGNET

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MONTRES PEQUIGNET

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20051231

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051224

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Effective date: 20060623

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051223

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-06-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060623

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-12-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2004-12-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182391

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69808142

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 224554

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020308

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT