Global Patent Index - EP 1047982 A1

EP 1047982 A1 2000-11-02 - WATCH CASE

Title (en)

WATCH CASE

Title (de)

UHRENGEHÄUSE

Title (fr)

BOITE DE MONTRE

Publication

EP 1047982 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99952210 A

Priority

  • CH 9900526 W
  • FR 9814597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2785998A1] The invention concerns a watch case comprising a casing (10) with a glass plate (18) and a middle (16), a bevel (36) and a handsetting stem (12). The casing (10) and the bevel (36) together define a sliding system (52, 54) to enable the bevel (36) to move laterally, a notched position system (48, 50) to define a rest position, and a stop (12, 46) to limit said lateral movement. The casing (10) and the bevel (36) are arranged in such manner that the bevel (36) covers two cutouts (34), provided in the ears (32) of the middle, when the notch (48, 50) is engaged, and releases one or the other of the two cutouts depending on its displacement direction, and constitutes an end stop to limit its displacement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 37/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/16 (2006.01); A44C 5/14 (2006.01); G04B 37/14 (2006.01); G04B 37/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/1486 (2013.01); A44C 5/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785998 A1 20000519; FR 2785998 B1 20010216; DE 69926726 D1 20050922; EP 1047982 A1 20001102; EP 1047982 B1 20050817; JP 2002530656 A 20020917; WO 0029912 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LA MONTRE HERMES S.A.

- Free text: LA MONTRE HERMES S.A.#35, ROUTE DU PORT#2501 BIENNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- LA MONTRE HERMES S.A.#ERLENSTRASSE 31A#2555 BRUEGG (CH)

2006-03-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-18 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051118

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926726 P 20050922

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE