Global Patent Index - EP 1048043 A1

EP 1048043 A1 2000-11-02 - SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (en)

SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHALTVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF INTERRUPTEUR

Publication

EP 1048043 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99962059 A

Priority

  • DE 9903686 W
  • DE 19853587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19853587A1] An operating element of a rotary potentiometer and an operating element (41) of a push switch (40) are arranged concentrically. The rotary potentiometer has a hollow cylindrical shape, in the inside of which the push switch is arranged. Light guiding elements are arranged inside the rotary potentiometer. Mounting and/or guiding elements for the operating elements are also provided inside the rotary potentiometer. The operating element of the potentiometer may be rigidly connected to a slider (20). LEDs are typically provided for illuminating the push switch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 3/02 (2006.01); H01H 19/14 (2006.01); H01H 25/00 (2006.01); H01H 25/06 (2006.01); H01H 89/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/0213 (2013.01); H01H 25/065 (2013.01); H01H 2219/014 (2013.01); H01H 2229/064 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0031765A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19853587 A1 20000525; DE 59914005 D1 20070104; EP 1048043 A1 20001102; EP 1048043 B1 20061122; JP 2002530831 A 20020917; US 6531952 B1 20030311; WO 0031765 A1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-18 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120308

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061122

2007-10-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20070814

2007-06-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061122

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070305

2007-02-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070222

2007-01-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914005 P 20070104

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061122

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE