Global Patent Index - EP 1048144 A2

EP 1048144 A2 2000-11-02 - COMMUNICATION AGENT BETWEEN A SYSTEM ADMINISTRATOR AND A DISTRIBUTED RESOURCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A REQUEST ON AN ATTRIBUTE CAPABLE OF MULTIPLE INSTANTIATION

Title (en)

COMMUNICATION AGENT BETWEEN A SYSTEM ADMINISTRATOR AND A DISTRIBUTED RESOURCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A REQUEST ON AN ATTRIBUTE CAPABLE OF MULTIPLE INSTANTIATION

Title (de)

KOMMUNIKATIONSAGENT ZWISCHEN EINEM SYSTEMSVERWALTER UND EINEM SYSTEM VON VERTEILTEN BETRIEBSMITTELN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDELUNG VON ATTRIBUTABFRAGEN

Title (fr)

AGENT DE COMMUNICATION ENTRE UN ADMINISTRATEUR DE SYSTEME ET UN SYSTEME DE RESSOURCES DISTRIBUEES ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE REQUETE SUR UN ATTRIBUT

Publication

EP 1048144 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99957215 A

Priority

  • FR 9901536 W
  • FR 9808057 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780587A1] The system provides enhanced management of distributed resources. The procedure handles requests from an administrator directed to a communication agent which supports a number of resources. Each resource is represented by a model containing the necessary information for management of the resource, the model being managed by the communication agent. In order to decentralise the processing of requests at the level of the communication agent, with the aid of a unique request number which is specific to the administrator, the requests are formalised in a request table included within the resource model. Specific requests are identified with the aid of an identification attribute held within the table enabling identification of the instances of the occurrence of specific attributes. A specific operation is then effected in response to detection of the attribute.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 41/00 (2013.01); H04L 12/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967908A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780587 A1 19991231; FR 2780587 B1 20040604; EP 1048144 A2 20001102; WO 9967908 A2 19991229; WO 9967908 A3 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVIDIAN

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060720

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB