Global Patent Index - EP 1048171 A1

EP 1048171 A1 2000-11-02 - TV BROADCAST VAN AND PORTABLE REPLAY DEVICE

Title (en)

TV BROADCAST VAN AND PORTABLE REPLAY DEVICE

Title (de)

FERNSEHRUNDFUNKWAGEN UND TRAGBARES WIEDERGABEGERÄT

Title (fr)

FOURGONNETTE DE TELEDIFFUSION ET DISPOSITIF PORTABLE DE LECTURE

Publication

EP 1048171 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903047 A

Priority

  • US 9900604 W
  • US 7111998 P
  • US 11046898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935827A1] The present invention provides on-field sports officials with a system for monitoring, reviewing and evaluating sports or other events in nearly real time. The system for selecting and reviewing signal segments comprises (i) a selection system (140) including means (132) for receiving at least one signal, means (150) for identifying at least one segment of the signal, and means (134) for transmitting the signal segment, and (ii) a reviewing system (220), including means (215) for receiving the signal, means (212) for storing the signal segment, and means (216) for reviewing information in the signal segment. The reviewing system may be a hand-held device, and may also include means for manipulating information in the signal segment, so that the user may, for example, rewind, fast-forward, freeze, enlarge or play in slow motion images from a sports or other event.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/38; H04N 5/222

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04N 5/38 (2006.01); H04N 5/76 (2006.01); H04N 5/222 (2006.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04N 5/445 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/76 (2013.01); H04N 5/38 (2013.01); H04N 21/21805 (2013.01); H04N 21/2187 (2013.01); H04N 21/41407 (2013.01); H04N 21/433 (2013.01); H04N 21/47217 (2013.01); H04N 21/4728 (2013.01); H04N 21/6587 (2013.01); H04N 21/84 (2013.01); H04N 5/222 (2013.01); H04N 5/4448 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935827 A1 19990715; WO 9935827 A9 19990930; AU 2316399 A 19990726; AU 763657 B2 20030731; AU 763657 C 20040527; CA 2317472 A1 19990715; EP 1048171 A1 20001102; EP 1048171 A4 20010502; IL 137261 D0 20010724; JP 2002501342 A 20020115; NO 20003566 A 20000912; NO 20003566 D0 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032502

2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2001-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCANZ COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE