Global patent index - EP 1048229 A2

EP 1048229 A2 2000-11-02 - Apparatus and method for manufacturing cigarettes

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for manufacturing cigarettes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Zigaretten

Title (fr)

Appareil et méthode pour fabriquer des cigarettes

Publication

EP 1048229 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106893 A

Priority

DE 19919182 A

Abstract (en)

The cigarette manufacturing device has a double length cigarette rod (10) provided with a fliter at either end before separa into 2 halves, to provide a pair of filter cigarettes (18), with transport of the cigarette rods through each part of the manufacturing process via rotary drums and endless transport belts which are each provided with spaced recesses along their lemg for locating the individual cigarette rods.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen bzw. Transportieren von Zigaretten, insbesondere Filterzigaretten (18), die aus (doppelt langen) Tabakstöcken (10) gebildet, mit zunächst doppelt langen Filterstopfen (14) verbunden und mittig im Bereich derselben durchtrennt werden. Die Tabakstöcke (10), Zigaretten (15), Doppelzigaretten (22) und Filterzigaretten (18) werden teilweise durch einen Muldengurt transportiert, nämlich durch einen Zahnriemen mit Mulden (28) zur Aufnahme je eines Tabakstocks (10) oder von zwei Zigaretten (15) bzw. Filterzigaretten (18). Im Bereich von Arbeitsstationen werden die Tabakstöcke (10), Zigaretten etc. durch Trommeln transportiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/47 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/478 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048229 A2 20001102; EP 1048229 A3 20030604; EP 1048229 B1 20050518; DE 19919182 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-03-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 24C 5/52 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 24C 5/47 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 24C 5/32 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI