Global patent index - EP 1048235 A1

EP 1048235 A1 2000-11-02 - Watertight press fastener part

Title (en)

Watertight press fastener part

Title (de)

Wasserdichtes Druckknopfteil

Title (fr)

Elément de bouton-pression pourvu d'un joint d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 1048235 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99107581 A

Priority

EP 99107581 A

Abstract (en)

Watertight press fastener part formed of an eyelet part (1 or 3) comprising an eyelet body (2 or 4) or of a ball part (5) comprising a ball body (6) and a cap rivet (7) which is fixable to a flat material (9), preferably in the form of a climate membrane, in a watertight manner by riveting. An elastically deformable sealing element (11 or 13) which is constructed as a molded part contacts the flat material (9). This sealing element is penetrated by the rivet shank (8) of the cap rivet (7) and has, in the assembled state, due to the deformation of the rivet shank, a press face which is formed in an analogous manner by deformation and which surrounds the axial opening (10) of the press fastener part. Together with a counter-face at the eyelet part or at the ball part, the press face defines the clamping area for the flat material (9). A particularly secure hold in the flat material results even when the flat material is especially thick when the sealing element comprises a sleeve-like portion (15) followed by a radially outwardly extending annular disk-shaped portion (16), when the sleeve-like portion (15) of the sealing element is provided in the region of its free edge (20) with a radially outwardly directed reinforcement forming a circumferentially extending undercut (22) and the latter is provided with a circumferentially extending bevel (21) facilitating assembly, proceeding from the free edge and facing the annular disk-shaped portion. Further, for purposes of preassembly, this sealing element should be mounted on the eyelet body forming the eyelet part or on the ball body forming the ball part in such a way that it penetrates the axial opening of the eyelet body or the axial opening of the ball body, respectively, with its sleeve-shaped portion and, when subsequently riveted with the rivet shank of the cap rivet guided through the sleeve-shaped portion, contacts by its annular disk-shaped portion the flat material interposed between the eyelet part or ball part and cap rivet and can be pressed with this flat material (Fig. 11). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 17/0088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048235 A1 20001102; EP 1048235 B1 20040317; DE 69915593 D1 20040422; DE 69915593 T2 20050210; ES 2214765 T3 20040916; HK 1032341 A1 20041119

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100416

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100415

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100415

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-19 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1032341

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2214765

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69915593

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI