Global Patent Index - EP 1048260 A2

EP 1048260 A2 2000-11-02 - Vacuum cleaning apparatus with high filtering power

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaning apparatus with high filtering power

Title (de)

Saugreinigungsvorrichtung mit hoher Filterleistung

Title (fr)

Appareil de nettoyage par le vide muni d'un haut pouvoir filtrant

Publication

EP 1048260 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201418 A

Priority

IT MI990854 A

Abstract (en)

Vacuum cleaning apparatus with high filtering power comprising an outer housing operatively connected to air sucking, filtering and passage means, where said housing has a water collecting reservoir operatively connected to said sucked air passage means and to baffle means opposing said passage, so as to obtain a complete nebulization of at least a portion of the water into the sucked air, before the so obtained flow passes through said filtering means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/181 (2013.01); A47L 9/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048260 A2 20001102; EP 1048260 A3 20010124; IT 1312211 B1 20020409; IT MI990854 A1 20001023

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050414

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010616

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI