Global Patent Index - EP 1048326 A2

EP 1048326 A2 2000-11-02 - Rapid hose delivery apparatus

Title (en)

Rapid hose delivery apparatus

Title (de)

Schnellauslegevorrichtung für Schlauch

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le déploiement rapide de tuyau

Publication

EP 1048326 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303566 A

Priority

GB 9909533 A

Abstract (en)

A rapid hose delivery apparatus comprising an all-terrain vehicle and a hose deployment means is described. The all-terrain vehicle generally has four or more wheel drive, and preferably a low ground pressure. One such vehicle is a quad motorbike. The apparatus is able to deploy 'in one go' hundreds if not 1000 or more meters of hose over any terrain. Such apparatus could be used for deployment of fire hose for supplying water across inaccessible terrain. The apparatus may further include hose retrieval means for retrieving the hose after use. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 33/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 33/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048326 A2 20001102; EP 1048326 A3 20010905; GB 9909533 D0 19990623

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 62C 33/04 A, 7A 62C 27/00 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI