Global Patent Index - EP 1048358 A2

EP 1048358 A2 2000-11-02 - Water atomizing nozzle of impact type for dust suppression

Title (en)

Water atomizing nozzle of impact type for dust suppression

Title (de)

Wasserzerstäubungsdüse mit einer Prallfläche zur Staubbekämpfung

Title (fr)

Buse d'atomisation à surface d'impact pour la lutte contre les poussières

Publication

EP 1048358 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00107824 A

Priority

IT BG990027 A

Abstract (en)

This water atomizing nozzle forms microscopic water droplets by the action of a high-velocity annular air jet on a tubular water stream bouncing off external disintegrating walls of an impactor member (10), said action generating an air-water mixture which freely expands outside the nozzle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/26; B05B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/26 (2006.01); B05B 3/04 (2006.01); B05B 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/0486 (2013.01); B05B 1/265 (2013.01); B05B 7/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048358 A2 20001102; EP 1048358 A3 20011121; IT 1309484 B1 20020123; IT BG990027 A1 20001030

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-09-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI