Global patent index - EP 1048359 A2

EP 1048359 A2 2000-11-02 - Spray coating gun

Title (en)

Spray coating gun

Title (de)

Sprühbeschichtungspistole

Title (fr)

Pistolet de pulvérisation pour l'application de revêtements

Publication

EP 1048359 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101047 A

Priority

DE 19919037 A

Abstract (en)

The spray coating gun includes a manually adjustable path restricting means (2) through which the trigger-adjustable maximum operating path of the first valve body (8) and thus the adjustable largest possible flow opening cross-section of the material v (6, 8) can be restricted alternately to at least two different values. The path restricting means has an adjusting part (70) whi is alternately adjustable corresponding to at least two values in the piston longitudinal direction to at least two different longitudinal positions and is coupled to the second valve body (18) of the throttle valve (16, 18) for common adjustment in the pistol longitudinal direction.

Abstract (de)

Sprühbeschichtungspistole, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß ein manuell einstellbares Wegstreckenbegrenzungsmittel (2, 70, 74, 80, 54) vorgesehen ist, durch welches die mit dem Trigger (10) einstellbare maximale Betätigungsstrecke des ersten Ventilkörpers (8) und damit der einstellbare größtmögliche Strömungsöffnungsquerschnitt eines Ventils (6, 8) für Beschichtungsmaterial auf mindestens zwei verschiedene Werte alternativ begrenzbar ist, und daß das Wegstreckenbegrenzungsmittel einen Verstellteil (70) aufweist, welcher den mindestens zwei Werten entsprechend in Pistolenlängsrichtung auf mindestens zwei verschiedene Längspositionen alternativ einstellbar ist und mit dem Ventilkörper (18) eines Drosselventils (16, 18) für Druckluft gekuppelt ist zur gemeinsamen Einstellung in Pistolenlängsrichtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/12; B05B 1/30; B05B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/1209 (2013.01); B05B 7/0815 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048359 A2 20001102; EP 1048359 A3 20020703; EP 1048359 B1 20031022; AU 726660 B1 20001116; BR 0000772 A 20011009; DE 19919037 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040322

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2005-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-04-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004124

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ITW OBERFLAECHENTECHNIK GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI