Global Patent Index - EP 1048361 A2

EP 1048361 A2 2000-11-02 - Coating installation

Title (en)

Coating installation

Title (de)

Beschichtungsanlage

Title (fr)

Installation de revêtement

Publication

EP 1048361 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115462 A

Priority

DE 19919234 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2277456A1] A coating plant for coating strip-shaped material with covering material, in which the strip-shaped material which is to be coated is guided into a coating bath, and is guided between two coating rolls, which are partly immersed in the coating bath, out of the coating bath and past stripping nozzles, the bearings of the coating rolls being arranged outside of the coating bath. Preferably the strip-shaped material is guided into the coating bath by means of one or more deflector rolls of which at least one is arranged outside of the coating bath.

Abstract (de)

Beschichtungsanlage zur Beschichtung von bandförmigem Material (10) mit Überzugsmaterial, bei der das zu beschichtende bandförmige Material (10) in ein Beschichtungsbad (2) geführt und zwischen zwei teilweise in das Beschichtungsbad (2) eingetauchten Beschichtungsrollen (3,4) aus dem Beschichtungsbad (2) herausgezogen und an Abstreifdüsen (12,13) vorbeigeführt ist, wobei die Lager (5,6) der Beschichtungsrollen (3,4) außerhalb des Beschichtungsbad (2) angeordnet sind. Es können eine oder mehrere Umlenkrollen (8) vorgesehen sein, wobei mindestens die Lager (9) einer der Umlenkrollen (8) außerhalb des Beschichtungsbads (2) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 1/08; B05C 3/12; B05C 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/20 (2006.01); B05C 3/12 (2006.01); C23C 2/40 (2006.01); B05C 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 3/125 (2013.01); B05C 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048361 A2 20001102; EP 1048361 A3 20020918; AU 3800399 A 20001102; AU 742312 B2 20011220; BR 9902711 A 20010306; CA 2277456 A1 20001028; CN 1134309 C 20040114; CN 1271625 A 20001101; DE 19919234 A1 20001116; JP 2000328219 A 20001128; JP 3357318 B2 20021216; KR 100358829 B1 20021030; KR 20000067751 A 20001125; RU 2199603 C2 20030227; US 6562412 B1 20030513; ZA 9904522 B 20000225

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05C 1/08 A, 7B 05C 11/06 B, 7B 05C 3/12 B, 7C 23C 2/00 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI