Global Patent Index - EP 1048365 A2

EP 1048365 A2 2000-11-02 - Method and device for the cleaning of inverted bottles

Title (en)

Method and device for the cleaning of inverted bottles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überkopf-Behandlung von Flaschen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de nettoyage de bouteilles en position inversées

Publication

EP 1048365 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103832 A

Priority

DE 19909488 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909488A1] The device has a rotor (1) with several bottle grippers, to transport the bottle along a transport path (8) between entry (4) and exit (5) points and a workstation under the bottles with nozzles for liquid, gas or steam handling medium and a central rotating guide for the medium. The medium is preferably sterile air, and exits the nozzles through a positively or negatively charged electrode to balance the charge on the bottle.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zur Überkopf-Behandlung von Flaschen (2), insbesondere Rinser, mit mehreren an einem umlaufenden Transportelement (1) vorgesehenen Flaschengreifer (7) zur Mitnahme der Flaschen (2) auf einer sich zwischen einer Einlaufstelle (4) für die zu behandelnden Flaschen (2) und einer Auslaufstelle (5) für die behandelten Flaschen (2) erstreckenden Transportstrecke (8) sowie zum Wenden der Flaschen (2) für die Überkopf-Behandlung und mit an Arbeitsstationen unterhalb der gewendeten Flaschen (2) vorgesehenen Düsen (9) für den Austritt eines flüssigen und/oder gasförmigen und/oder dampfförmigen Behandlungsmediums während der Behandlungsphase und einer zentral angebrachten Zuführung für die Behandlungsmedien mittels Drehschieber und/oder Drehdurchführung. Hierbei ist vorgesehen, daß das behandelnde Medium insbesondere Sterilluft beim Austritt aus der Düse (9) durch eine Entladeelektrode (19) mit positiv und/oder negativ geladenen lonen zum vollständigen Ladungsausgleich der behandelnden Behältnisse beaufschlagbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/34; B08B 6/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 6/00 (2006.01); B08B 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/34 (2013.01); B08B 6/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909488 A1 20000907; DE 50013621 D1 20061130; EP 1048365 A2 20001102; EP 1048365 A3 20020925; EP 1048365 B1 20061018

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111122

2011-11-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111114

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070111

2006-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013621 P 20061130

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2006-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS AG

2006-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE CLEANING OF INVERTED BOTTLES

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040325

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI