Global patent index - EP 1048368 A2

EP 1048368 A2 2000-11-02 - Method and device for preventing thermal crown during hot rolling

Title (en)

Method and device for preventing thermal crown during hot rolling

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Vermeiden des thermischen Ballens beim Warmwalzen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour éviter un bombement thermique pendant le laminage à chaud

Publication

EP 1048368 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250127 A

Priority

  • DE 19921085 A
  • DE 10003303 A

Abstract (en)

Cased roll crowning prevention, by convection medium transport between the roll center and roll core surface channels and ax passage to a pump for medium return without active temperature modification, is new. Crowning of a cased roll, which consists of a casing shrink-fitted onto a core having helical surface grooves for forming convection medium flow channels extending symmetrically from the roll center to its ends and which operates with forced internal convection, is prevented by transporting the circulated convection medium (a) outwards from the roll center to the core surface channels; (b) from the core surface into the interior of the roll; (c) into an annular gap at the axial center of the roll; (d) inwards into a further annular gap for axial passage to the service side of the roll; and (e) to a pump which then feeds the convection medium, without active temperature modification, back into the axial center of the roll and the channels. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) a cased roll for use in the above process; (ii) a method of assembling the above cased roll; and (iii) a method of disassembling the above cased roll.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Vermeiden des thermischen Balles insbesondere beim Warmwalzen von Stahl, Aluminium und ähnlichen metallischen Werkstoffen mittels einer Mantelwalze, bestehend aus einem geschmiedeten Walzenkern, einem auf den Walzenkern aufgeschrumpften Walzenmantel sowie in die Oberfläche des Walzenkernes symmetrisch eingearbeiteten schraubenförmigen Nuten zur Bildung von Kanälen für die Strömungsführung eines Konvektionsmediums zwischen dem Walzenmantel und dem Walzenkern. Hierbei wird das im Kreislauf geführte Konvektionsmedium der mit innerer Zwangskonvektion arbeitenden Mantelwalze ausgehend von der Walzenmitte auf dem Außendurchmesser der Walzenkerns in den Kanälen nach außen transportiert, von dort in das Innere der Mantelwalze, dort in einem Ringspalt in die axiale Mitte der Mantelwalze, und von dort innen in einem weiteren Ringspalt in axialer Richtung zur Bedienseite der Mantelwalze und von dort aus einer Pumpe zugeführt, mit der dieses Konvektionsmedium ohne aktive Elemente zur Beeinflussung der Temperatur wieder in die axiale Mitte der Mantelwalze und den Kanälen der Außenfläche des Walzenkerns zugeleitet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 27/08; B21B 27/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/03 (2006.01); B21B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/08 (2013.01); B21B 27/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048368 A2 20001102; EP 1048368 A3 20030115

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOVESTAEDT, ERICH DR.-ING.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHWERDT, WILHELM DIPL.-ING

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI