Global Patent Index - EP 1048378 A1

EP 1048378 A1 2000-11-02 - Method of casting-in of hollow bodies in iron castings

Title (en)

Method of casting-in of hollow bodies in iron castings

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Eingiessen von Hohlkörpern in Eisengussbauteile

Title (fr)

Procédé pour insérer des corps creux pendant la coulée de pièces en fonte

Publication

EP 1048378 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125724 A

Priority

DE 19918987 A

Abstract (en)

Hollow body incorporation in a cast component, by partially evacuating a hollow body prior to sealing and placing in a casti mould, is new. A hollow body is incorporated in a cast ferrous metal component by forming a hollow body from sheet material, partially evacuating air from the body by pumping or heating, sealing the hollow body, placing the body in a casting mould and partially o completely enclosing the body with molten metal.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf das Eingießen von Hohlkörpern in Eisengußbauteile. Zur besseren Wärmeisolierung von Eisengußbauteilen werden Hohlräume angestrebt, um die Isolierung ruhender Luftschichten zu nutzen. Hohlräume die vom Guß vollständig umschlossen werden lassen sich nicht durch Gießkerne verwirklichen, da diese nicht zu entfernen sind. Erfindungsgemäß wird daher vorgeschlagen, die Hohlkörper in Blech vorzuformen und sie nach dem Einlegen in die Gießform vollständig in der Schmelze einzuschließen. Um beim Eingießen der heißen Schmelze ein unzulässiges Ansteigen des Luftdruckes im Hohlkörper zu vermeiden wird der Hohlkörper weitgehend luftleer gepumpt, oder der Hohlkörper wird vor dem Verschließen erhitzt. Durch das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren lassen sich beliebige Hohlräume in Gußstücken, beispielsweise in Auspuffkrümmem von Brennkraftmaschinen zur besseren Wärmedämmung realisieren.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048378 A1 20001102; EP 1048378 B1 20030723; DE 19918987 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091224

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906352 P 20030828

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI