Global Patent Index - EP 1048411 B1

EP 1048411 B1 2002-11-27 - Mountable clamping device

Title (en)

Mountable clamping device

Title (de)

Aufsitzspanner

Title (fr)

Griffe de serrage montable

Publication

EP 1048411 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102489 A

Priority

DE 19918696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048411A1] The spanner has a guide column (2) and clamping shoe (4) axially adjusted relative to column through clamping means (8, 9). clamping shoe is restricted in its movement about the guide column by suitable means such as a positioning ring (12) mounted on column and having a stop (14) interacting with a counter stop (17) on the shoe which limits its swivel region. The positioning ring can be detachably mounted on the guide column. A spring can be provided between clamping shoe and guid column

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06; B23Q 3/06; B23Q 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 3/06 (2006.01); B23Q 3/18 (2006.01); B25B 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048411 A1 20001102; EP 1048411 B1 20021127; DE 19918696 C1 20001207; JP 2000317760 A 20001121; US 6237905 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150205

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150205

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150205

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000805 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI