Global Patent Index - EP 1048424 A2

EP 1048424 A2 2000-11-02 - Composite corkplate and method for the production thereof

Title (en)

Composite corkplate and method for the production thereof

Title (de)

Korkverbundplatte und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Verbundplatte

Title (fr)

Panneau sandwich en liège et son procédé de production

Publication

EP 1048424 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108679 A

Priority

  • DE 29907260 U
  • DE 19921019 A

Abstract (en)

Cork composite plate (A) comprises a carrier layer made of compacted, glued lignocellulose particles (I), especially wood ch or fibers, and at least one covering layer made from glued cork particles (II). The covering layer is bound to the carrier by simultaneous and mutual compression of glued (I) and (II). An Independent claim is also included for a multilayer (A) in which (II) form at least one of the exterior surfaces of the plate and (I) form a middle layer, with the plate having density 0.4-0.8 g/cc.

Abstract (de)

Eine Korkverbundplatte mit einer Mittel- oder Innenschicht aus Hozspänen und einer oder zwei Außenschichten aus Korkteilchen wird dadurch hergestellt, daß die Schichten aus beleimten Korkteilchen bzw. Holzspänen gemeinsam in einem einzigen Arbeitsgang miteinander verpreßt werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048424 A2 20001102; EP 1048424 A3 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRINES, MANFRED

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROFFAEL, EDMONE, PROF. DR.-ING

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-04-11 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-04-11 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI