Global Patent Index - EP 1048425 A2

EP 1048425 A2 2000-11-02 - Process for forming muti-coloured porcellainized ceramic stone tiles by extrusion

Title (en)

Process for forming muti-coloured porcellainized ceramic stone tiles by extrusion

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von mehrfarbigen porzellanähnlichen keramischen Ziegeln durch Extrudieren

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication par extrusion de briques multicolores en céramique porcelainisée

Publication

EP 1048425 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201306 A

Priority

IT RE990050 A

Abstract (en)

A process for forming tiles of porcellainized ceramic stone by extrusion, comprising the following operations: preparing at least two pastes, typologically defined as porcellainized ceramic stone, having different colours; feeding said at least two pastes into a mixing device and/or injecting them directly into the extruder chamber (6); subjecting the mixed material to the action of a screw extruder (7); subjecting the mass advancing within the extruder (6), downstream of the screw (7) and upstream of the die braking system, to the action of at least one flow deviator means (9,10,11,12); from the extruded web obtained in this manner, separating portions corresponding to the formed objects. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/00 (2006.01); B28B 3/22 (2006.01); B30B 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/245 (2013.01); B28B 1/005 (2013.01); B28B 3/22 (2013.01); B28B 3/2672 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048425 A2 20001102; EP 1048425 A3 20030102; EP 1710062 A2 20061011; EP 1710062 A3 20080305; EP 1710062 B1 20100825; IT 1309755 B1 20020130; IT RE990050 A1 20001027; IT RE990050 D0 19990427

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080822

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SACMI COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA SOCIETA' COOPERA

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28B 3/20 A, 7B 28B 1/00 B, 7B 29C 47/04 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI