Global Patent Index - EP 1048449 A1

EP 1048449 A1 2000-11-02 - Shaft door for a baling press of vertical type

Title (en)

Shaft door for a baling press of vertical type

Title (de)

Schachttür für eine Ballenpresse vertikaler Bauart

Title (fr)

Porte de fosse pour une presse à balles du type vertical

Publication

EP 1048449 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108132 A

Priority

EP 99108132 A

Abstract (en)

The press shaft door (2) has a guide consisting of two guide track units by which the feeder shaft door (4) is slid parallel with the plane of the press shaft door between closed and open positions. The feeder shaft door in an open position is completely ins the outer dimensions of the press shaft door. Each vertical end side of the feeder shaft door has at least one track following b guided by a guide track of the guide track unit.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Schachttür für eine Ballenpresse beschrieben, welche aus einer Preßschachttür (2) mit einer Einfüllschachtöffnung (3) und einer Einfüllschachttür (4), mittels welcher die Einfüllschachtöffnung (3) verschließbar ist, besteht, beschrieben, welche möglichst platzsparend sein soll und gleichzeitig die Vorteile einer als Schiebtür ausgebildeten Einfüllschachttür (4) gewährleistet. Zu dieser Aufgabe wird vorgeschlagen, an der Preßchachttür eine Führungseinrichtung vorzusehen, mit deren Hilfe die Einfüllschachttür (4) im wesentlichen parallel zur Türebene der Preßschachttür (4) zwischen einer geschlossenen Stellung und einer geöffneten Stellung verschiebbar ist, wobei die Einfüllschachttür (4) in der geöffneten Stellung vollständig innerhalb der Außenabmessungen der Preßschachttür zu liegen kommt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/3032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DK ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048449 A1 20001102; EP 1048449 B1 20061129; AT 346743 T 20061215; DK 1048449 T3 20070305; ES 2277400 T3 20070701

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150426

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150426

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150426

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 346743

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150426

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140414

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140415

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2277400

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-03-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-03-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2007-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070117

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DK ES FR GB SE

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040823

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DK ES FR GB SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DK ES FR GB SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI