Global Patent Index - EP 1048450 A2

EP 1048450 A2 2000-11-02 - Method to determine the position of a plunger in a powder press

Title (en)

Method to determine the position of a plunger in a powder press

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Positionbestimmung eines Pressstempels einer Pulverpresse

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer la position d'un poinçon dans une presse à poudre

Publication

EP 1048450 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103757 A

Priority

DE 19919693 A

Abstract (en)

The position detection method has a processor (50) which stores a reference value corresponding to a given position of the press stamp (20) relative to the press matrix (34) and a reference offset corresponding to the count provided by an incremental source (32) upon the raising of the press stamp from the reference position to an index pulse position, above which its movement is detected via an absolute position detector (24,26). The press stamp position is provided by the incremental source count when the actual position is less than the sum of the stored reference value and the stored reference offset.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Positionsbestimmung eines Preßstempels bezüglich einer Matrize in einer Pulverpresse mit folgenden Schritten: in einem Rechner wird ein Referenzmaß gespeichert, das einem vorgegebenen relativ geringen Abstand des Preßstempels zur Oberkante oder Unterkante der Matrize entspricht, im Rechner wird ein Referenzoffset gespeichert, der dadurch ermittelt wird, daß die Impulse eines vom Preßstempel betätigten inkrementalen Wegaufnehmers beim Hochfahren des Preßstempels vom Referenzmaß bis zu einem Indeximpuls gezählt werden, oberhalb des Referenzoffset wird die Position des Preßstempels mit Hilfe eines absoluten Wegaufnehmers gemessen, der den Weg des Verstellkolbens für den Preßstempel ermittelt und dessen Meßwerte in den Rechner gegeben werden und sobald die Istposition des Preßstempels gleich oder kleiner ist als das Summenmaß von Referenzoffset und Referenzmaß, werden die Impulse des inkrementalen Wegaufnehmers zur Positionierung in den Rechner gegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/03 (2006.01); B30B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/03 (2013.01); B30B 11/005 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2999/00 + B22F 3/03 + B22F 2203/03

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048450 A2 20001102; EP 1048450 A3 20020904; DE 19919693 A1 20001123; DE 19919693 C2 20010823; US 6442859 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030906

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FETTE GMBH

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000304

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI