Global patent index - EP 1048459 A1

EP 1048459 A1 2000-11-02 - Web-fed offset printing press for production of business forms or the like

Title (en)

Web-fed offset printing press for production of business forms or the like

Title (de)

Rollenoffsetdruckmaschine zur Herstellung von Geschäftsformularen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Presse offset à bobines pour la production de formulaires commerciaux ou similaires

Publication

EP 1048459 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107360 A

Priority

  • JP 15845799 A
  • JP 23367999 A

Abstract (en)

A web-fed offset printing press suitable for production of business forms, having a series of printing stations (5) in each of which an inked image is printed from a plate cylinder (6) to a blanket cylinder (7) and thence offset to a web (P) running against an impression cylinder (8). In order to realize fine adjustment of the rotational speed of the impression cylinder and hence to cause the web to be fed under proper tension by the impression cylinder despite possible variations in paper thickness, cylinder diameter, etc., two separate drive linkages (e.g. gear trains) are provided, one (13a) for driving the plate cylinder (6) and blanket cylinder (7), and the other (13b or 13b') for driving the impression cylinder (8). The drive linkage (13b) for the impression cylinder has a speed changer (20) coupled thereto. The two drive linkages are coupled to a common drive source in one embodiment and to separate drive sources in another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B65H 20/02 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41P 2213/20 (2013.01); B41P 2213/208 (2013.01); B41P 2213/73 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048459 A1 20001102; EP 1048459 B1 20031203; DE 60006888 D1 20040115; DE 60006888 T2 20040519; JP 2001010752 A 20010116; JP 4318109 B2 20090819

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070405

2007-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050504

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60006888

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE IT NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI