Global Patent Index - EP 1048460 A2

EP 1048460 A2 2000-11-02 - Influence of the FAN-out in a wet-offset rotary printing

Title (en)

Influence of the FAN-out in a wet-offset rotary printing

Title (de)

Beeinflussung des FAN-OUT in einem Nassoffset Rotationsdruck

Title (fr)

Influence de la déformation en éventail dans l'impression en offset humide rotative

Publication

EP 1048460 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810346 A

Priority

DE 19918399 A

Abstract (en)

The indexing drive process is for a drive for a cylinder (D1-D4) or an indexing roll (20) of a rotary printing press (DT). A change in the longitudinal expansion (e1,e2) of a sector of the print material course (B) is reported in the form of measurement (V1,V2,S1,S2) and is compensated by indexing setting of the cylinder and/or the indexing roll. An Independent claim is also included for a method for controlling the indexing drive of a rotary printing press.

Abstract (de)

In einem Verfahren zur Beeinflussung des FAN-OUT in einem Nassoffset Rotationsdruck wird durch Messung auf einem Weg einer Bedruckbahn zwischen einer Zugwalze eines Vorspannwerks vor mehreren Druckzylindern und einer Zugwalze eines Auszugwerks hinter den Druckzylindern eine Breite oder Querdehnung der Bedruckbahn ermittelt. Die ermittelte Breite oder Querdehnung wird für eine Antriebsregelung von wenigstens einer der Zugwalzen verwendet, derart, dass die wenigstens eine der Zugwalzen auf Einhaltung einer konstanten Breite bzw. Querdehnung der Bedruckbahn geregelt angetrieben wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/02; B41F 13/12; B65H 23/02; B65H 23/188

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/025 (2013.01); B41F 13/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048460 A2 20001102; EP 1048460 A3 20021009

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070807

2007-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WIFAG MASCHINENFABRIK AG

2007-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 13/02 A, 7B 41F 13/12 B, 7B 65H 23/02 B, 7B 65H 23/188 B, 7B 65H 23/038 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI