Global Patent Index - EP 1048461 A1

EP 1048461 A1 2000-11-02 - Method for register control in coincident printing of several sections colours

Title (en)

Method for register control in coincident printing of several sections colours

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Registersteuerung beim Übereinanderdruck mehrerer Teilfarben

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la commande de registre dans l'impression coincidente des plusieurs couleurs de sections

Publication

EP 1048461 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107048 A

Priority

DE 19919741 A

Abstract (en)

The register control method uses register setting devices (10,11) for ensuring correct alignment between a number of superimposed partial images (8) printed in different colors, with simultaneous adjustment of the position of all partial images by the same amount and in the same direction, at periodic intervals which have a greater duration than the duration of the printing cycles.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Registersteuerung beim Übereinanderdruck mehrerer Teilfarben, bei dem mit Hilfe von Registereinsteilvorrichtungen die Lage der mit den Teilfarben auf einen Bedruckstoff erzeugten Teilbilder passergerecht zueinander eingestellt werden. Mit der Erfindung soll die Verschmutzung von Druckfarbe führenden Zylindern vermindert werden und die Druckqualität verbessert werden. Die Erfindung besteht darin, daß die Lage aller Teilbilder (8) auf dem Bedruckstoff (1) gleichzeitig uni den gleichen Betrag und gleicher Richtung laufend geändert wird. Die Erfindung ist insbesondere bei Offsetdruckmaschinen anwendbar, die einen Übertragungszylinder mit einem Kanal aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/14; B41F 33/00; B41F 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/08 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B41F 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/18 (2013.01); B41F 13/14 (2013.01); B41F 33/0081 (2013.01); B41F 35/06 (2013.01); B41P 2233/52 (2013.01); B41P 2235/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048461 A1 20001102; EP 1048461 B1 20030709; DE 19919741 A1 20001102; JP 2000318135 A 20001121; JP 4900991 B2 20120321; US 2006201368 A1 20060914; US 2008034993 A1 20080214; US 7131379 B1 20061107; US 7281475 B2 20071016; US 7584700 B2 20090908

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002794

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002794

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110503

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002794 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI