Global Patent Index - EP 1048462 A1

EP 1048462 A1 2000-11-02 - Printing device

Title (en)

Printing device

Title (de)

Druckvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression

Publication

EP 1048462 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108074 A

Priority

DE 19918943 A

Abstract (en)

The printing device has a cylinder (1) mounted by bearings in the side walls and having a replaceable sleeve-like cover (19) which is detachably fixed on the sleeve face (31) of the cylinder and protrudes on the side of the access sideways over the cylinder. A holder (23, 24) for the cover can be placed on and off the inside of the protruding part of the cover . This holder structurally joined to a bearing part (16) of the cylinder which to change the cover can be positioned so that the access openin released. The cover has a toner-transferring surface in the sleeve face area of the cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Druckvorrichtung mit einen in Seitenwänden gelagerten Zylinder mit einem durch eine Öffnung einer Seitenwand hindurch auswechselbaren, hülsenförmigen Aufzug. Es ist Aufgabe der Erfindung, eine Druckvorrichtung zu entwickeln, bei der der Wechsel eines hülsenförmigen Aufzuges vereinfacht und die Gefahr der Beschädigung des Aufzuges verringert wird. Die Erfindung besteht darin, daß auf der Mantelfläche (18) des Zylinders (1) ein lösbar befestigter Aufzug (19) vorgesehen ist, der auf der Seite der Öffnung seitlich am Zylinder (1) übersteht, daß eine am Inneren des überstehenden Teiles (21) des Aufzuges (19) an- und abstellbare Haltevorrichtung (23, 24, 25, 26, 28) für den Aufzug (19) vorgesehen ist, wobei die Haltevorrichtung (23, 24, 25, 26, 28) mit einem Lagerteil (16) des Zylinders (1) baulich vereinigt ist, und daß zum Wechseln des Aufzuges das Lagerteil (16) in eine die Öffnung freigebende Lage positionierbar ist. Die Erfindung ist bei elektrostatischen, elektrophotografischen und bei magnetografischen Druckvorrichtungen anwendbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/20; B41F 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/20 (2006.01); B41F 27/10 (2006.01); G03G 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/20 (2013.01); B41F 27/105 (2013.01); B41P 2227/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4332364 A1 19940428 - HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048462 A1 20001102; EP 1048462 B1 20030709; DE 19918943 A1 20001102; JP 2000330454 A 20001130; US 6240267 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-07-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-01-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002795 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI