EP 1048463 A1 20001102 - Process for inking a printing plate with thermoplastic inks and ink tanks to be used therein
Title (en)
Process for inking a printing plate with thermoplastic inks and ink tanks to be used therein
Title (de)
Verfahren zum Einfärben einer Druckplatte mit thermopastischen Tinten sowie dafür verwende Tintenbehälter
Title (fr)
Procédé pour l'encrage d'une plaque d'impression avec des encres thermoplastiques et réservoirs d'encre utilisés dans celui-ci
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 99870075 A 19990429
Abstract (en)
The invention relates to a process for inking a printing plate attached to a holder, with a thermoplastic ink, to be used in pad printing, whereby a relative movement is maintained between the holder and an ink tank filled with thermoplastic ink, characterised in that the holder or the ink tank, or both these components are heated at the temperature required for the thermoplastic ink. The invention also relates to the ink tanks to be used in this process. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41F 17/34 (2006.01); B41F 17/00 (2006.01); B41M 1/40 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B41F 17/001 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] DE 4015684 A1 19911121 - TAMPOFLEX GMBH [DE]
- [PA] EP 0917953 A1 19990526 - PRINTING INTERNATIONAL [BE]
- [A] EP 0736380 A1 19961009 - PRINTING INTERNATIONAL [BE]
- [A] WO 9737850 A1 19971016 - TECA PRINT AG [CH], et al
- [A] DE 4027587 C1 19911002
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 491 (M - 1190) 12 December 1991 (1991-12-12)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 385 (M - 864) 25 August 1989 (1989-08-25)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 623 (M - 1511) 17 November 1993 (1993-11-17)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1048463 A1 20001102; AT E236015 T1 20030415; AU 4095100 A 20001117; CA 2372449 A1 20001109; DE 60001930 D1 20030508; DE 60001930 T2 20040304; DK 1173332 T3 20030728; EA 003872 B1 20031030; EA 200101147 A1 20020627; EP 1173332 A1 20020123; EP 1173332 B1 20030402; ES 2198300 T3 20040201; JP 2003526538 A 20030909; PT 1173332 E 20030829; WO 0066363 A1 20001109
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 99870075 A 19990429; AT 00920295 T 20000421; AU 4095100 A 20000421; BE 0000044 W 20000421; CA 2372449 A 20000421; DE 60001930 T 20000421; DK 00920295 T 20000421; EA 200101147 A 20000421; EP 00920295 A 20000421; ES 00920295 T 20000421; JP 2000615225 A 20000421; PT 00920295 T 20000421