Global patent index - EP 1048494 A1

EP 1048494 A1 2000-11-02 - Combination monitoring device and patch for a pneumatic tire and method of installing the same with a coupled antenna

Title (en)

Combination monitoring device and patch for a pneumatic tire and method of installing the same with a coupled antenna

Title (de)

Zusammensetzung von einer Überwachungseinrichtung und Auflage für einen Luftreifen und Verfahren um diese mit einer gekuppelten Antenne zu montieren

Title (fr)

Combinaison d'un dispositif de surveillance et d'un patch pour pneumatique et méthode d'installation de celui-ci avec une antenne couplée

Publication

EP 1048494 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00106365 A

Priority

US 30179399 A

Abstract (en)

A monitoring device (14) and patch (16) combination used to monitor the conditions of a pneumatic tire having an innerliner includes a monitoring device and a patch. The monitoring device includes at least one sensing element (18) that is adapted to sense a condition of the pneumatic tire. The monitoring device also includes a first electrical pad connected to the sensing element. The monitoring device and first electrical pad (26) are preferably encapsulated in an encapsulation material (30). The patch (16) is adapted to carry the monitoring device (14) and mount the monitoring device on the innerliner of the tire. An antenna (34) is embedded within the patch and a second electrical pad (36) is connected to the antenna. The monitoring device is disposed on the patch in a manner such that the first and second electrical pads are aligned to provide electrical coupling between the pads. The antenna (34) is in communication with the sensing element (18) through the electrical coupling between the pads. The monitoring device and patch may be manufactured in separate facilities and then brought together when they are connected to the innerliner of the tire without the requirement of a physical connection between the sensing element and the antenna. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2006.01); B29C 33/02 (2006.01); B29C 35/02 (2006.01); B60C 19/00 (2006.01); B60C 23/02 (2006.01); B60C 23/04 (2006.01); G01M 17/02 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/2241 (2013.01); B60C 23/0433 (2013.01); B60C 23/0493 (2013.01); H01Q 1/22 (2013.01); B29D 2030/0072 (2013.01); B29D 2030/0077 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048494 A1 20001102; EP 1048494 B1 20030521; BR 0002261 A 20010313; CA 2307241 A1 20001029; CA 2307241 C 20081028; DE 60002778 D1 20030626; DE 60002778 T2 20040219; DE 60012371 D1 20040826; DE 60012371 T2 20050113; DE 60012793 D1 20040909; DE 60012793 T2 20050210; EP 1254787 A2 20021106; EP 1254787 A3 20030827; EP 1254787 B1 20040804; EP 1254788 A2 20021106; EP 1254788 A3 20030827; EP 1254788 B1 20040721; ES 2193906 T3 20031116; ES 2225702 T3 20050316; ES 2229033 T3 20050416; JP 2001013042 A 20010119; JP 4409716 B2 20100203; US 6208244 B1 20010327; ZA 200001622 B 20001027

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193906

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60002778

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICA TIRE LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI