Global Patent Index - EP 1048543 A1

EP 1048543 A1 2000-11-02 - Railway vehicle bogie with three steered wheel sets

Title (en)

Railway vehicle bogie with three steered wheel sets

Title (de)

Einstellbares Drehgestell mit drei Radsätzen für ein Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Bogie de véhicule ferroviaire à trois essieux à orientation dirigée

Publication

EP 1048543 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105779 A

Priority

DE 19919208 A

Abstract (en)

The bogie has a central (12) and two end (3) wheel sets arranged in a frame (2). Each wheel set has a drive unit. For a curv path, the end wheel sets turn outwards against the longitudinal direction of the frame. Each end wheel set is connected to the f at its drive unit with at least one inclined shaft (1). The central wheel set is connected to the frame with at least one longitudinal shaft parallel to the frame.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Drehgestell mit drei Radsätzen für ein Schienenfahrzeug angegeben, in dem zwei Endradsätze (3) an ihren Antriebseinheiten mit jeweils mindestens einem Schräglenker (1) mit einem Drehgestellrahmen (2) verbunden sind und ein Mittelradsatz (12) mit mindestens einem parallel zur Längsrichtung des Drehgestellrahmens (2) geführtem Längslenker (4) am Drehgestellrahmen verbunden ist. Die Endradsätze (3) sind über jeweils mindestens einen Querlenker (5a,b) und über einen am Querlenker (5a,b) in Wirkverbindung angeordneten Antriebseinheitsausleger (13) mit der Antriebseinheit des Mittelradsatzes (12) derart verbunden, dass bei einer Querbewegung des Mittelradsatzes (12) die Endradsätze (3) mitgekoppelt sind und dass bei einer Ausdrehbewegung der Endradsätze (3) diese gegensinnig gekoppelt sind. Desweiteren weisen die Antriebseinheiten jeweils mindestens eine Bremseinrichtung (8) auf, wobei jede dieser Bremseinrichtungen (8) direkt am Motor (6) oder am Getriebegehäuse (11) angeordnet ist und auf mindestens eine Radscheibe (10) des zugehörigen Radsatzes (3,12) einwirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/38; B61F 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 3/06 (2006.01); B61F 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/38 (2013.01); B61F 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048543 A1 20001102; EP 1048543 B1 20021204; AT 228952 T 20021215; DE 19919208 A1 20001102; US 6401627 B1 20020611; ZA 200001531 B 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100318

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000855

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 228952

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI