Global Patent Index - EP 1048564 A1

EP 1048564 A1 2000-11-02 - Device for transferring a pulverulent product in a container which can be closed by a cover

Title (en)

Device for transferring a pulverulent product in a container which can be closed by a cover

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Überführen eines körnigen Materials in einen mit einem Deckel verschliessbaren Behälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transfert d'un produit pulvérulent dans un conteneur obturable par un couvercle

Publication

EP 1048564 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401104 A

Priority

FR 9905083 A

Abstract (en)

Method involves transfer of powder vertically, from top to bottom, through transferring apparatus, and downstream from inlet pipe (1) to cased well. During transfer of powder, inside of apparatus, including inside of lower end of inlet pipe, is kept is mild depression so as to ensure good ventilation, avoid accumulation of powder within apparatus, or escape to outside. An Independent claim is also included for the transferring apparatus for powdery product.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet un procédé de remplissage d'un conteneur (6), obturable par un couvercle (6b); remplissage avec un produit pulvérulent. Elle a également pour objet le dispositif de transfert associé audit procédé, dispositif pouvant être qualifié de tête de remplissage. Lesdits procédé et dispositif sont particulièrement performants en terme de confinement dudit produit pulvérulent. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21C 21/02 (2006.01); B65B 1/06 (2006.01); B65B 37/02 (2006.01); B65B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/06 (2013.01); B65B 39/003 (2013.01); B65B 39/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048564 A1 20001102; EP 1048564 B1 20070307; DE 60033724 D1 20070419; DE 60033724 T2 20071115; FR 2792607 A1 20001027; FR 2792607 B1 20010706; JP 2000335518 A 20001205; JP 4475444 B2 20100609; RU 2243926 C2 20050110; US 6293316 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070515

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60033724 P 20070419

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2007-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING A PULVERULENT PRODUCT IN A CONTAINER WHICH CAN BE CLOSED BY A COVER

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI