Global Patent Index - EP 1048565 A1

EP 1048565 A1 2000-11-02 - Method and device for packaging objects in a film-hood

Title (en)

Method and device for packaging objects in a film-hood

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen in einer Folienhaube

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des objets dans une housse en feuille

Publication

EP 1048565 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107667 A

Priority

EP 99107667 A

Abstract (en)

To wrap a package with a film shrouding, especially a stacked pallet, before the film shrouding (6) is released its lower ed is clamped by the gripper frame section (14) at the lower edge of the wrapped stack and/or the pallet, and is moved inwards to give under stretch in relation to the pulled-over shrouding contour.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Verpacken von Gegenständen sind eine Einrichtung zur Herstellung einer Folienhaube 6 und eine Überziehvorrichtung 8, 9, 10, 11, 12 zum Greifen und Aufspannen der Folienhaube 6 vorgesehen. Die Folienhaube 6 wird auf mehrere Greifeinrichtungen 8 aufgezogen und derart aufgespannt, daß die aufgespannte Öffnung der Folienhaube 6 größer als der zu verpackende Gegenstand ist, wobei die Folienhaube 6 mit einer gewissen Dehnung quer zu der Ebene der aufgespannten Öffnung der Folienhaube über den Gegenstand gezogen wird. Anschließend wird die Folienhaube 6 mit den bügelförmigen Rahmenabschnitten 14 festgeklemmt, um dann mit der eingeklemmten Folienhaube 6 einen Unterstretch zu erzeugen. Gemäß der Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen ist die Überziehvorrichtung 8, 9, 10, 11, 12 an einem Rahmen in eine vertikale Richtung entlang des zu verpackenden Gegenstandes bewegbar und weist mehrere Greifeinrichtungen 8 auf, die in einer im wesentlichen horizontale Richtung zu und weg von dem Gegenstand bewegbar sind. Jede Greifeinrichtung 8 weist Mittel 13, 14, wie einen Klappmechanismus auf, um einen an der Greifeinrichtung 8 anliegenden Folienabschnitt festzuklemmen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/135 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048565 A1 20001102; EP 1048565 B1 20051026; DE 59912711 D1 20051201

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060727

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912711

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KL- LACHENMEIER A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030326

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI