Global patent index - EP 1048568 A1

EP 1048568 A1 2000-11-02 - Method and device for checking cigarettes

Title (en)

Method and device for checking cigarettes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von Zigaretten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour contrôler des cigarettes

Publication

EP 1048568 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104767 A

Priority

DE 19919207 A

Abstract (en)

The cigarette testing method has a respective push-rod (35) brought into contact with the end of each tested cigarette by ax displacement, with an electrical, magnetic or electromagnetic field sensor (32) providing a signal dependent on the push-rod position, for comparison with a signal corresponding to the ideal push-rod position. An Independent claim for a cigarette testing device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von Zigaretten (12) beim Herstellen oder Verpacken der Zigaretten (12), wobei ein Stößel (35) axial in Richtung eines Zigarettenendes verschoben wird, so daß bei unkorrekter Ausbildung oder Fehlen einer Zigarette (12) der Stößel (35) eine von einer Idealposition abweichende Position einnimmt. Der Erfindung liegt das Problem zugrunde, daß Prüfen von Zigaretten zu verbessern und weniger störungsanfällig zu gestalten. Dieses Problem wird durch ein erfindungsgemäßes Verfahren dadurch gelöst, daß in Abhängigkeit der Position des Stößels (35) ein einem Sensor (32, 53) zugeordnetes elektrisches, magnetisches oder elektromagnetisches Feld beeinflußt wird, wobei aus der Beeinflussung ein der Stößelposition entsprechendes Signal erzeugt wird. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung eine Vorrichtung zum Durchführen dieses Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/30; B65B 19/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/00 (2006.01); A24C 5/343 (2006.01); B65B 19/30 (2006.01); B65B 19/32 (2006.01); B65B 57/16 (2006.01); G01D 5/14 (2006.01); G01D 5/20 (2006.01); G01R 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/30 (2013.01); B65B 19/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048568 A1 20001102; EP 1048568 B1 20040609; BR 0002259 A 20001107; CN 1211253 C 20050720; CN 1271677 A 20001101; DE 19919207 A1 20001102; JP 2000350570 A 20001219; US 6508138 B1 20030121

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160304

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50006723

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150304

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110304

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100304

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006723

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030530

2001-08-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI