Global Patent Index - EP 1048571 A1

EP 1048571 A1 2000-11-02 - Apparatus for packaging a palettized load by means of a heat shrinkable sleeve

Title (en)

Apparatus for packaging a palettized load by means of a heat shrinkable sleeve

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum umhüllen einer palettisierten Ladung mittels eines Heissschrumpfschlauches

Title (fr)

Dispositif de manutention pour la pose d'une gaine plastique thermorétractable sur une charge palettisée

Publication

EP 1048571 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410041 A

Priority

FR 9905415 A

Abstract (en)

A handling apparatus has a device applying a heat shrinkable film to an article on a pallet, a sucking device to draw the bo edge of the film below a palette support and a warm air device to shrink the film. A control mechanism operates two sets of actuators and associated devices supporting the pallet support and the pallet respectively so that the film can be attached to t underside of the pallet without changing the level of the pallet. The actuators and associated devices may be cams and followers. An air extracting fan within a two part telescopic skirt is vertically movable beneath the pallet support.

Abstract (fr)

Un dispositif de manutention pour la pose d'une gaine (17) plastique thermorétractable sur une charge (1) palettisée, comprend un premier jeu d'organes d'actionnement (7) coopérant avec des chaînes de transfert (3) mobiles placées sous les traverses (11) de la palette support (2), un deuxième jeu d'organes d'actionnement (13) coopérant avec des plots de manoeuvre (9) disposés dans l'intervalle ménagé entre les chaînes de transfert (3), et destinés à venir en appui contre la surface inférieure des planches de la palette (2) sans interférer avec les traverses (11) longitudinales et:/ou transversales, et un mécanisme de commande des deux jeux d'organes d'actionnement (7, 13) pour maintenir les chaînes de transfert (3) contre les traverses (11) lorsque les plots de manoeuvre (9) sont écartés des planches de la palette (2), et réciproquement pour maintenir les plots de manoeuvre (9) contre lesdites planches en position écartée des chaînes de transfert (3), autorisant l'aspiration de l'extrémité inférieure de la gaine (17) sous les traverses (11) sans soulever la charge qui reste en permanence à un même niveau. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 53/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 53/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 53/066 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0133462 A2 19850227 - MSK VERPACKUNG SYST GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048571 A1 20001102; EP 1048571 B1 20040303; DE 60008618 D1 20040408; ES 2215593 T3 20041016; FR 2792609 A1 20001027; FR 2792609 B1 20010713

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160414

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215593 T3

2004-09-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60008618 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THIMON

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES GB IT NL

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010420

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT NL

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI