Global Patent Index - EP 1048573 A1

EP 1048573 A1 2000-11-02 - Drive and support device for tools

Title (en)

Drive and support device for tools

Title (de)

Antriebs- und Tragvorrichtung für Werkzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support et d'entraînement d'outils

Publication

EP 1048573 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107832 A

Priority

  • DE 19917852 A
  • DE 19917853 A

Abstract (en)

Two (P) tool carriers (1, 7) are held apart at a controlled distance. A double arrangement of such carriers can be turned on common, driven (3) support shaft (5). Fixed to the shaft is an eccentric cam (6'), transferring the working stroke to the tool carrier (7). The carrier pair can be pivoted as required about the shaft to operate on the packing conveyor belt. Two (P) tool carriers (1, 7) are held apart at a controlled distance. A double arrangement of such carriers can be turned o common, driven (3) support shaft (5). Fixed to the shaft is an eccentric cam (6'), transferring the working stroke to the tool carrier (7). The carrier pair (P) with its gap (2) for the packing material band, which is bordered by the tool carriers (1, 7), be pivoted as required about the shaft, in accordance with the necessary tool configuration in the working position, to operate the packing conveyor belt. The position adopted, can be adjusted and fixed. Preferred features: On the support shaft (5), rotated independently of the shaft, is a support casing (8) which can be fixe position relative to the frame (4). This carries radial, parallel guide shafts (9) for each pair (P) of tool carriers. The first tool carrier (1) is fixed to its ends; the second (7) slides upon it, led by the eccentrics (6') which operate through penetrati (10) of the casing. The eccentrics (6') are at the ends of a shell (6) fixed to the shaft. The support casing is connected to a swiveling drive (11) outside the workstation frame (4), or to a lever allowing movement to various fixed positions. Outer cams ( on both sides, close to the machine frame (4), are connected to the tool carrier which moves on the parallel shafts. Rollers (13 14) act with the cams during a stamping stroke. Springs load the moving tool carriers against the cam and cam-follower roller arrangement. These may be tensioned against the support casing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antriebs- und Tragvorrichtung für die Bearbeitungswerkzeuge in Bearbeitungsstationen von Verpackungsmaschinen, insbesondere solchen zur Herstellung und Füllung sogenannter Blisterpakkungen, wobei die Bearbeitungsstationen, wie Form-,Siegel-,Codierungs-, Perforations-, Stanzstationen od.dgl., längs einer Packstoffbahnförderstrecke (PBF) hintereinander angeordnet und jeweils aus einem ersten und einem zweiten, mit Bearbeitungswerkzeugen bestückbaren Werkzeugträger (1,7) gebildet und diese gegeneinander im Arbeits- und Fördertakt der zu verarbeitenden Packstoffbahn (PB) verstellbar sind. Nach der Erfindung sind die beiden zueinander auf Zwangsdistanz gehaltenen Werkzeugträger (1,7) als Werkzeugträgerpaare (P) mindestens zweifach auf einer gemeinsamen, von einem Antrieb (3) drehbaren, in einem Stationsgestell (4) gelagerten Trägerwelle (5) angeordnet. Auf der gemeinsamen Trägerwelle (5) ist drehfest ein Arbeitshubübertragungselement (6) angeordnet, das in Wirkverbindung mit dem benachbarten Werkzeugträger (7) steht, wobei die Trägerpaare (P) mit ihrem jeweils von ihren Werkzeugträgern (1,7) begrenzten Packstoffbahndurchlaufspalt (2) wahlweise und um die Trägerwelle (5) schwenkbar je nach erforderlichem Werkzeugformat in Arbeitsstellung zur Packstoffbahnförderstrecke (PBF) einstell- und fixierbar ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 59/00; B23Q 39/00; B26D 5/16; B26D 9/00; B29C 33/36; B65B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/16 (2006.01); B26D 9/00 (2006.01); B26D 11/00 (2006.01); B65B 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/00 (2013.01); B26D 5/16 (2013.01); B26D 9/00 (2013.01); B26D 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3605864 C1 19870619 - HASSIA VERPACKUNG AG

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048573 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020401

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010427

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI