Global Patent Index - EP 1048589 A1

EP 1048589 A1 2000-11-02 - Improved packaging for moist towelettes

Title (en)

Improved packaging for moist towelettes

Title (de)

Verbesserte Verpackung für feuchte Tücher

Title (fr)

Emballage amélioré pour lingettes humides

Publication

EP 1048589 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303353 A

Priority

US 30088899 A

Abstract (en)

A package and/or system for containing and dispensing disposable wipes, such package/system constructed and configured to enhance automation, facilitate economical modification and promote consumer product satisfaction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/20 (2006.01); B65D 83/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/2096 (2013.01); B65D 83/08 (2013.01); B65D 2203/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048589 A1 20001102; CA 2306143 A1 20001028; MX PA00004142 A 20030728

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020518

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020107

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI