Global Patent Index - EP 1048605 A1

EP 1048605 A1 2000-11-02 - Multiple function crane with telescope jib

Title (en)

Multiple function crane with telescope jib

Title (de)

Multifunktionskran mit einem Teleskopausleger

Title (fr)

Grue avec flèche à fonctions multiples

Publication

EP 1048605 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420078 A

Priority

FR 9905408 A

Abstract (en)

Jib (7) comprises successive jib elements : jib foot (14), jib intermediate (15), and jib spike (16). Motorized mechanism, comprising jack (19) and link mechanism (20), links upper pylon (9) to jib foot for controlling rotation of jib foot relative to upper pylon. Jib intermediate comprises first short section (22), motorized using jack (25) and link mechanism (26); and second long sec (23), motorized using jack mechanism (28). Jib spike is motorized using jack (30) and link mechanism (31).

Abstract (fr)

La grue comprend un mât (6), monté sur un châssis (1, 4), et une flèche distributrice (7) composée de trois éléments successifs (14, 15, 16) articulés entre eux autour d'axes horizontaux (24, 29), le premier élément de flèche (14) étant articulé autour d'un axe horizontal (18) au sommet du mât (6). Le premier élément de flèche (14), et éventuellement l'élément suivant (15), peuvent être amenés en position sensiblement verticale, dans l'alignement du mât (6) dressé, de manière à réhausser le mât. Tous les éléments de flèche (14, 15, 16) comportent un chemin de roulement (17) pour un chariot (32), et ces éléments sont utilisables dans diverses positions (B, F, F1). Les articulations sont motorisées par des dispositifs à vérin (28), ou à vérin (25, 30) et embiellage (26, 31). On obtient ainsi une grue à configuration modifiable, pour des utilisations variées. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/34; B66C 13/54; B66F 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/42 (2006.01); B66C 13/54 (2006.01); B66C 23/34 (2006.01); B66C 23/68 (2006.01); B66F 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/34 (2013.01); B66C 13/54 (2013.01); B66F 11/046 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048605 A1 20001102; EP 1048605 B1 20040218; DE 60008307 D1 20040325; DE 60008307 T2 20041202; ES 2213556 T3 20040901; FR 2792627 A1 20001027; FR 2792627 B1 20010601; JP 2000318977 A 20001121; RU 2271330 C2 20060310; US 6439408 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150419

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60008307

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140420

2015-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150526

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *POTAIN

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2005-06-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050609

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213556 T3

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60008307 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI