Global patent index - EP 1048611 A1

EP 1048611 A1 2000-11-02 - Harness accessory for a horse

Title (en)

Harness accessory for a horse

Title (de)

Pferdezaumzeugzubehör

Title (fr)

Accessoire de harnachement pour cheval

Publication

EP 1048611 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201336 A

Priority

FI 990183 U

Abstract (en)

Harness accessory, such as a saddle or a harness tree, intended to rest on the back of a horse or other animal which serves as a racing, work or riding animal, said saddle or harness tree including the present harness accessory as a body part thereof. According to the present invention said harness accessory body part includes a stiff, bent metallic member such as a bent steel member (1), having a shape essentially compliant with the shape of the horse's back. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68B 3/00 (2006.01); B68C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68B 3/00 (2013.01); B68C 1/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 98203108 A 19980917

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048611 A1 20001102; FI 4101 U1 19990831; FI 990183 U0 19990419

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI