Global Patent Index - EP 1048627 A2

EP 1048627 A2 2000-11-02 - Titanium/tin oxide films

Title (en)

Titanium/tin oxide films

Title (de)

Titan-Tinoxidfilme

Title (fr)

Films de l'oxyde de titanium et d'étain

Publication

EP 1048627 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303105 A

Priority

US 30288599 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is a substrate having a surface coated with a singular metal oxide film wherein the metal consists essentially of titanium and tin and the film is made from a liquid mixture of a titanate, a tin compound, and an anhydrous organic liquid. The substrate may be glass and the film applied by pyrolytic decomposition of the liquid mixture in air. Preferably, the film has a refractive index of greater than 2.2 and no visible light absorption to give it an optimal neutral appearance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03C 17/25; C23C 16/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 17/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03C 17/253 (2013.01); C03C 17/256 (2013.01); C03C 2217/211 (2013.01); C03C 2217/212 (2013.01); C03C 2217/23 (2013.01); C03C 2218/112 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12618 (2013.01); Y10T 428/263 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048627 A2 20001102; EP 1048627 A3 20020717; EP 1048627 B1 20060712; CA 2307070 A1 20001030; DE 60029273 D1 20060824; DE 60029273 T2 20070719; US 6312831 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60029273

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60029273

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-11-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-18 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20060925

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60029273 P 20060824

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-02 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20021227

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2003-03-26 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 03C 17/25 A, 7C 23C 16/40 B, 7C 23C 18/02 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI