Global Patent Index - EP 1048696 A2

EP 1048696 A2 2000-11-02 - Method for preparation of hydrophobic precipitated silica

Title (en)

Method for preparation of hydrophobic precipitated silica

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung hydrophober gefällter Kieselsäure

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation de silice de précipitation hydrophobe

Publication

EP 1048696 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303304 A

Priority

US 29986399 A

Abstract (en)

A method for the preparation of hydrophobic precipitated silica. The method comprises contacting an aqueous suspension of a hydrophilic precipitated silica with (1) a catalytic amount of an acid and (2) an organosilicon compound in the presence of (3) a water-miscible organic solvent in an amount sufficient to facilitate reaction of the hydrophilic precipitated silica with the organosilicon compound to form a hydrophobic precipitated silica.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09C 1/30; C01B 33/193; C09C 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 33/18 (2006.01); C01B 33/193 (2006.01); C09C 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09C 1/3081 (2013.01); C01B 33/193 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/90 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048696 A2 20001102; EP 1048696 A3 20010207; EP 1048696 B1 20041215; DE 60016661 D1 20050120; DE 60016661 T2 20051006; JP 2000327321 A 20001128; US 6184408 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150419

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150419

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60016661

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140416

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60016661

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, ENGELS & PARTNER MBB, PATENTANWAELT, DE

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60016661 P 20050120

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI